Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alexander Macdonell

Deceased

Bishop of Alexandria in Ontario, Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Nov 1833Born
20 Dec 186229.1Ordained PriestPriest
18 Jul 189056.7AppointedBishop of Alexandria in Ontario, Canada
28 Oct 189056.9Ordained BishopBishop of Alexandria in Ontario, Canada
29 May 190571.5DiedBishop of Alexandria in Ontario, Canada

MicroData Summary for Alexander Macdonell
Bishop Alexander Macdonell (born , died ) Bishop of Alexandria in Ontario

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLochiel, Ireland
Ordained BishopAlexandria, Diocese of Alexandria in Ontario

  • a priest for 42.4 years
  • a bishop for 14.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 88
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1890, Number 75

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 25 May 2017