Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop William Dominic O’Carroll, O.P. †

Deceased

Coadjutor Archbishop of Port of Spain, Trinidad and Tobago, Antilles

Titular Bishop of Alabanda


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Mar 1826Born
10 Oct 184317.5ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Preachers
28 Apr 184822.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
3 Feb 187447.8AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Port of Spain, Trinidad and Tobago, Antilles
3 Feb 187447.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Alabanda
24 May 187448.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Alabanda
13 Oct 188054.5DiedCoadjutor Archbishop of Port of Spain, Trinidad and Tobago, Antilles

MicroData Summary for William Dominic O’Carroll
Bishop William Dominic O’Carroll O.P. (born , died ) Coadjutor Archbishop of Port of Spain

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLimerick, Diocese of Limerick, Ireland
Ordained BishopCathedral, Port of Spain, Archdiocese of Port of Spain, Trinidad and Tobago

  • a priest for 32.4 years
  • a bishop for 6.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 83, and Page 466
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,874, Number 29
  • ob/c24: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 26, Number 1,459

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast