Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mariano Fernández Fortique

Deceased

Bishop of Guayana

Titular Bishop of Capharnaum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Feb 1791BornCaracas
20 May 181524.2Ordained PriestPriest
12 Jul 184150.4AppointedBishop of Guayana, Venezuela
3 Apr 184251.1Ordained BishopBishop of Guayana, Venezuela
6 Feb 185463.0ResignedBishop of Guayana, Venezuela
18 Aug 185463.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Capharnaum
11 Nov 186675.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Guayana, Venezuela

MicroData Summary for Mariano Fernández Fortique:
Bishop Mariano Fernández Fortique (born , died ) Bishop of Guayana

  • a priest for 51.5 years
  • a bishop for 24.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 179
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 209

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013