Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Silvestre Guevara y Lira

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela

Titular Archbishop of Amasea


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1814¹BornChamariapa, Spain
1835¹21.0Ordained PriestPriest
27 Sep 185238.7AppointedArchbishop of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela
6 Feb 185339.1Ordained BishopArchbishop of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela
6 Jul 187662.5ResignedArchbishop of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela
9 Jan 187763.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Amasea
20 Feb 188268.1DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Silvestre Guevara y Lira:
Archbishop Silvestre Guevara y Lira (died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela

  • a priest for 47.1 years
  • a bishop for 29.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: CB
  • bp/bd/op/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 92, and Page 315

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013