Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Juan Antonio Ignacio Fernández Peña y Angulo

Deceased

Archbishop of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Mar 1781BornMérida
7 Mar 180423.0Ordained PriestPriest
15 Jul 184160.3AppointedArchbishop of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela
2 Jan 184260.8Ordained BishopArchbishop of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela
18 Jan 184967.8DiedArchbishop of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela

MicroData Summary for Juan Antonio Ignacio Fernández Peña y Angulo:
Archbishop Juan Antonio Ignacio Fernández Peña y Angulo (born , died ) Archbishop of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela

  • a priest for 44.8 years
  • a bishop for 7.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: CB
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 392

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015