Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Rimantas Norvila

Bishop of Vilkaviškis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Dec 1957 BornBaptai
24 Feb 199133.2Ordained PriestPriest of Kaunas, Lithuania
28 May 199739.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Kaunas, Lithuania
28 May 199739.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Castrum
29 Jun 199739.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Castrum
5 Jan 200244.0AppointedBishop of Vilkaviškis, Lithuania

MicroData Summary for Rimantas Norvila:
Bishop Rimantas Norvila (born ) Bishop of Vilkaviškis

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Vilkaviškis.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 149, Number 13,028

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015