Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jonas Ivanauskas

Bishop of Kaišiadorys, Lithuania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Feb 1960 Born
14 Apr 198525.1Ordained PriestPriest of Kaunas, Lithuania
18 Oct 200343.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Kaunas, Lithuania
18 Oct 200343.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Canapium
23 Nov 200343.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Canapium
11 Feb 201251.9AppointedBishop of Kaišiadorys, Lithuania

MicroData Summary for Jonas Ivanauskas
Bishop Jonas Ivanauskas (born ) Bishop of Kaišiadorys

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAlytus

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Kaišiadorys.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 11 Feb 2012
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 173, Number 14,485

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018