Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Butler

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Cork


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1731¹Born
20 Dec 175524.9Ordained PriestPriest
11 Apr 176332.2SelectedBishop of Cork, Ireland
16 Apr 176332.2ConfirmedBishop of Cork, Ireland
Jun 1763³32.4Ordained BishopBishop of Cork, Ireland
3 Jun 178756.4ResignedBishop of Cork, Ireland
8 May 180069.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Cork, Ireland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for John Butler:
Bishop John Butler (born 1731, died ) Bishop Emeritus of Cork

  • a priest for 44.3 years
  • a bishop for 36.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 106, Number 9,220
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 182
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1763, Number 38

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.1, 31 Dec 2015; Data: 3 Jan 2016