Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nicolás González y Pérez, C.M.F. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Fernando Poo, Equatorial Guinea

Titular Bishop of Ionopolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Feb 1869Born
6 Aug 189324.5Ordained PriestPriest of Missionary Sons of the Immaculate Heart of Mary
24 Aug 191849.5AppointedVicar Apostolic of Fernando Poo, Equatorial Guinea
24 Aug 191849.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Ionopolis
30 Nov 191849.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ionopolis
23 Mar 193566.1DiedVicar Apostolic of Fernando Poo, Equatorial Guinea

MicroData Summary for Nicolás González y Pérez
Bishop Nicolás González y Pérez C.M.F. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Fernando Poo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLa Nuez de Arriba, Spain

  • a priest for 41.6 years
  • a bishop for 16.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • op/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 112, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1918, Number 59

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast