Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Blaise Nzeyimana

Bishop of Ruyigi, Burundi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jun 1954 Born
25 Jul 198127.1Ordained PriestPriest of Gitega, Burundi
30 Oct 201056.4AppointedBishop of Ruyigi, Burundi
15 Jan 201156.6Ordained BishopBishop of Ruyigi, Burundi

MicroData Summary for Blaise Nzeyimana
Bishop Blaise Nzeyimana (born ) Bishop of Ruyigi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceButare

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Ruyigi.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 30 Oct 2010
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 205, Number 16,936
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 2011, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast