Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Richard Ng

Bishop of Miri


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jun 1966 BornKuching
18 Feb 199528.6Ordained PriestPriest of Kuching, Malaysia
30 Oct 201347.3AppointedBishop of Miri, Malaysia
25 Jan 201447.5Ordained BishopBishop of Miri, Malaysia

MicroData Summary for Richard Ng:
Bishop Richard Ng (born ) Bishop of Miri

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Miri.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 30 Oct 2013
  • ob: CB, 6 Nov 2013
  • c2+: CB, 25 Jan 2014
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 217, Number 18,077

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015