Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jacques Le Févre du Quesnoy

Deceased

Bishop of Coutances, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1707¹Born
17 Apr 175750.2SelectedBishop of Coutances, France
18 Jul 175750.5ConfirmedBishop of Coutances, France
21 Aug 175750.6Ordained BishopBishop of Coutances, France
9 Sep 176457.6DiedBishop of Coutances, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jacques Le Févre du Quesnoy
Bishop Jacques Le Févre du Quesnoy (born 1707, died ) Bishop of Coutances

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGolleville

  • a bishop for 7.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1757, Number 26
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 179

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast