Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Matthew Hassan Kukah

Bishop of Sokoto


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Aug 1952 BornKulu
19 Dec 197624.3Ordained PriestPriest of Kaduna, Nigeria
10 Jun 201158.8AppointedBishop of Sokoto, Nigeria
8 Sep 201159.0Ordained BishopBishop of Sokoto, Nigeria

MicroData Summary for Matthew Hassan Kukah:
Bishop Matthew Hassan Kukah (born ) Bishop of Sokoto

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Sokoto.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 10 Jun 2011
  • ob: CB, 20 Jun 2011
  • c23: CB, 8 Sep 2011
  • c34: CB, 11 Sep 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 207, Number 17,135

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013