Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alejo del Carmen Obelar Colman, S.D.B. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Chaco Paraguayo

Titular Bishop of Montemarano


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Jul 1917BornConcepción
23 Nov 194124.3Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
6 Mar 196951.6AppointedVicar Apostolic of Chaco Paraguayo, Paraguay
6 Mar 196951.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Montemarano
29 Jun 196951.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Montemarano
13 Sep 198669.2ResignedVicar Apostolic of Chaco Paraguayo, Paraguay
30 Dec 198972.5DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Chaco Paraguayo, Paraguay

MicroData Summary for Alejo del Carmen Obelar Colman:
Bishop Alejo del Carmen Obelar Colman S.D.B. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Chaco Paraguayo

  • a priest for 48.1 years
  • a bishop for 20.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 130
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 195, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013