Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luis Clemente de la Vega Rodriguez

Deceased

Bishop of Tulcán, Ecuador


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Aug 1921Born
29 Jun 194624.8Ordained PriestPriest
17 Mar 196543.5AppointedBishop of Tulcán, Ecuador
26 May 196543.7Ordained BishopBishop of Tulcán, Ecuador
3 May 198765.6DiedBishop of Tulcán, Ecuador

MicroData Summary for Luis Clemente de la Vega Rodriguez
Bishop Luis Clemente de la Vega Rodriguez (born , died ) Bishop of Tulcán

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Isidro

  • a priest for 40.8 years
  • a bishop for 21.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 109, Additions/Corrections (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast