Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giovanni Enrico (John Henry) Boccella, T.O.R. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Izmir (Smirne)

Titular Archbishop of Ephesus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Jun 1912BornCastelfranci, Italy
29 Mar 194128.8Ordained PriestPriest of Third Order Regular of St. Francis of Penance
9 Sep 196755.2AppointedArchbishop of Izmir (Smirne), Turkey
17 Apr 196855.8Ordained BishopArchbishop of Izmir (Smirne), Turkey
7 Dec 197866.5ResignedArchbishop of Izmir (Smirne), Turkey
7 Dec 197866.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Ephesus
22 May 199279.9DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Izmir (Smirne), Turkey

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Enrico (John Henry) Boccella:
Archbishop Giovanni Enrico (John Henry) Boccella T.O.R. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Izmir (Smirne)

  • a priest for 51.1 years
  • a bishop for 24.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 144

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013