Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph John Gerry, O.S.B.

Bishop Emeritus of Portland, Maine


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Sep 1928 BornMillinochet
2 Jul 194819.8ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
12 Jun 195425.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
4 Feb 198657.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Manchester, New Hampshire, USA
4 Feb 198657.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Praecausa
21 Apr 198657.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Praecausa
21 Dec 198860.3AppointedBishop of Portland, Maine, USA
21 Feb 198960.4InstalledBishop of Portland, Maine, USA
10 Feb 200475.4RetiredBishop of Portland, Maine, USA

MicroData Summary for Joseph John Gerry:
Bishop Joseph John Gerry O.S.B. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Portland

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Portland.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 18 Dec 2013