Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Telesphore George Mpundu

Archbishop Emeritus of Lusaka, Zambia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 May 1947 Born
17 Dec 197225.5Ordained PriestPriest
7 Mar 198739.7AppointedBishop of Mbala, Zambia
21 Jun 198740.0Ordained BishopBishop of Mbala, Zambia
1 Oct 200457.3AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Lusaka, Zambia
28 Oct 200659.4SucceededArchbishop of Lusaka, Zambia
30 Jan 201870.6ResignedArchbishop of Lusaka, Zambia

MicroData Summary for Telesphore George Mpundu (VIAF: 279170588)
Archbishop Telesphore George Mpundu (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Lusaka

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKopeka
Ordained BishopCathedral, Mbala, Diocese of Mbala

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Lusaka.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • s: Bollettino, 28 Oct 2006
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 105, Number 9,150
  • r: Bollettino, 30 Jan 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 9 Apr 2018