Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Héctor Luis Morales Sánchez

Bishop of Netzahualcóyotl, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Sep 1954 BornTamuin
17 Jan 197924.3Ordained PriestPriest of Ciudad Valles, San Luís Potosí, México
15 Oct 200551.1AppointedPrelate of Huautla, Oaxaca, México
17 Jan 200651.3Ordained BishopPrelate of Huautla, Oaxaca, México
7 Jan 201156.3AppointedBishop of Netzahualcóyotl, México, México

MicroData Summary for Héctor Luis Morales Sánchez:
Bishop Héctor Luis Morales Sánchez (born ) Bishop of Netzahualcóyotl

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Netzahualcóyotl.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 15 Oct 2005
  • ob: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 184, Number 15,039
  • c4: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 185, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • ab: Bollettino, 7 Jan 2011

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013