Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierre Goudreault

Bishop of Sainte-Anne-de-la-Pocatière, Québec, Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 May 1963 Born
16 Jun 199027.0Ordained DeaconDeacon of Rouyn-Noranda, Québec, Canada
18 May 199127.9Ordained PriestPriest of Rouyn-Noranda, Québec, Canada
8 Dec 201754.5AppointedBishop of Sainte-Anne-de-la-Pocatière, Québec, Canada
10 Mar 201854.7Ordained BishopBishop of Sainte-Anne-de-la-Pocatière, Québec, Canada

MicroData Summary for Pierre Goudreault
Bishop Pierre Goudreault (born ) Bishop of Sainte-Anne-de-la-Pocatière

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRouyn-Noranda, Diocese of Timmins, Ontario
Ordained BishopSainte-Anne, Cathedral, La Pocatière, Diocese of Sainte-Anne-de-la-Pocatière, Québec

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Sainte-Anne-de-la-Pocatière.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 8 Dec 2017
  • od/c1: CB, 10 Mar 2018
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 235, Number 19,686

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast