Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nicolás Pérez Gavilán y Echeverría

Deceased

Bishop of Chihuahua, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Nov 1856Born
21 Feb 188023.2Ordained PriestPriest of Durango, México
5 Mar 190245.2AppointedBishop of Chihuahua, México
11 May 190245.4Ordained BishopBishop of Chihuahua, México
3 Dec 191963.0DiedBishop of Chihuahua, México

MicroData Summary for Nicolás Pérez Gavilán y Echeverría
Bishop Nicolás Pérez Gavilán y Echeverría (born , died ) Bishop of Chihuahua

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDurango

  • a priest for 39.7 years
  • a bishop for 17.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: JPG
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 201
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1902, Number 23

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast