Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Francisco de Paula Mendoza y Herrera

Deceased

Archbishop of Durango


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Nov 1852BornTinguindín
21 Nov 187523.0Ordained PriestPriest
7 Jan 190552.1AppointedBishop of Campeche, México
2 Feb 190552.2Ordained BishopBishop of Campeche, México
20 Feb 190552.3InstalledBishop of Campeche, México
7 Aug 190956.7AppointedArchbishop of Durango, México
12 Nov 190957.0InstalledArchbishop of Durango, México
23 Jul 192370.7DiedArchbishop of Durango, México

MicroData Summary for Francisco de Paula Mendoza y Herrera:
Archbishop Francisco de Paula Mendoza y Herrera (born , died ) Archbishop of Durango

  • a priest for 47.7 years
  • a bishop for 18.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 197, Number 16,034
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1905, Number 4
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 163

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013