Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Miguel Peinado Peinado

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Jaén


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Oct 1911BornBerchules
15 Jun 193523.6Ordained PriestPriest
30 Apr 197159.5AppointedBishop of Jaén, Spain
20 Jun 197159.7Ordained BishopBishop of Jaén, Spain
31 May 198876.6RetiredBishop of Jaén, Spain
12 Feb 199381.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Jaén, Spain

MicroData Summary for Miguel Peinado Peinado:
Bishop Miguel Peinado Peinado (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Jaén

  • a priest for 57.6 years
  • a bishop for 21.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 137

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015