Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Arturo Rivera Damas, S.D.B. †

Deceased

Archbishop of San Salvador


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Sep 1923BornSan Esteban Catarina
19 Sep 195329.9Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
30 Jul 196036.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of San Salvador, El Salvador
30 Jul 196036.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Legia
23 Oct 196037.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Legia
19 Sep 197753.9AppointedBishop of Santiago de María, El Salvador
28 Feb 198359.4AppointedArchbishop of San Salvador, El Salvador
26 Nov 199471.1DiedArchbishop of San Salvador, El Salvador

MicroData Summary for Arturo Rivera Damas:
Archbishop Arturo Rivera Damas S.D.B. (born , died ) Archbishop of San Salvador

  • a priest for 41.1 years
  • a bishop for 34.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Necrology (back)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1960, Number 105

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015