Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop St. Ezequiel Moreno y Díaz, O.A.R. †

Deceased

Bishop of Pasto, Colombia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Apr 1848Born
21 Sep 186416.4ProfessedMember of Order of Augustinian Recollects
3 Jun 187123.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Augustinian Recollects
23 Oct 189345.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Pinara
1 May 189446.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Pinara
8 Jun 189446.1AppointedVicar Apostolic of Casanare, Colombia
2 Dec 189547.6AppointedBishop of Pasto, Colombia
19 Aug 190658.3DiedBishop of Pasto, Colombia
26 Oct 1975Beatified
11 Oct 1992Canonized

MicroData Summary for St. Ezequiel Moreno y Díaz (VIAF: 74938157)
Bishop St. Ezequiel Moreno y Díaz O.A.R. (born , died ) Bishop of Pasto

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAlfaro, Diocese of Tarazona (-Tudela), Spain
Ordained BishopCathedral, Bogota, Archdiocese of Santafé en Nueva Granada

  • a priest for 35.2 years
  • a bishop for 12.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 443, and Page 454
  • c1: CB, 24 Jul 2014
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1894, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 12 Jun 2017