Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gregorio Nicolás Casas y Conde, O.A.R. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Casanare

Titular Bishop of Hadrianopolis in Honoriade


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Sep 1854BornAlfaro, Spain
15 Nov 187218.2ProfessedMember of Order of Augustinian Recollects
23 Dec 187622.3Ordained DeaconDeacon of Order of Augustinian Recollects
22 Sep 187723.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Augustinian Recollects
2 Dec 189541.2AppointedVicar Apostolic of Casanare, Colombia
2 Dec 189541.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Hadrianopolis in Honoriade
12 Apr 189641.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hadrianopolis in Honoriade
5 Apr 190651.6DiedVicar Apostolic of Casanare, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Gregorio Nicolás Casas y Conde:
Bishop Gregorio Nicolás Casas y Conde O.A.R. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Casanare

  • a priest for 28.5 years
  • a bishop for 10.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 77

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 22 Jul 2014