Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop János Mikes

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Szombathely

Titular Archbishop of Selymbria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Jun 1876BornZabola
29 Jun 189923.0Ordained PriestPriest of Transilvania, Erdély, Siebenbürgen, Romania
11 Dec 191135.5AppointedBishop of Szombathely, Hungary
7 Jan 191235.5Ordained BishopBishop of Szombathely, Hungary
10 Jan 193659.5ResignedBishop of Szombathely, Hungary
10 Jan 193659.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Acmonia
21 Nov 193660.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Helenopolis in Palaestina
5 Aug 193963.1AppointedTitular Archbishop of Selymbria
28 Mar 194568.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Szombathely, Hungary

MicroData Summary for János Mikes:
Archbishop János Mikes (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Szombathely

  • a priest for 45.7 years
  • a bishop for 33.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • op: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1912, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013