Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Mikel Cardinal Koliqi

Deceased

Cardinal-Deacon of Ognissanti in Via Appia Nuova


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Sep 1902Born
30 May 193128.6Ordained PriestPriest of ShkodrŽ, Albania
26 Nov 199492.1AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Ognissanti in Via Appia Nuova
26 Nov 199492.1Elevated to Cardinal
28 Jan 199794.3DiedCardinal-Deacon of Ognissanti in Via Appia Nuova

MicroData Summary for Mikel Koliqi
Mikel Cardinal Koliqi (born , died ) Cardinal-Deacon of Ognissanti in Via Appia Nuova

EventPlace
Birth PlaceShkodrŽ, Archdiocese of ShkodrŽ, Albania
Ordained PriestJesuit fathers, Church, ShkodrŽ, Archdiocese of ShkodrŽ, Albania
Death PlaceShkodrŽ, Archdiocese of ShkodrŽ, Albania
Buried Place (Original)Crypt, Cathedral, ShkodrŽ, Archdiocese of ShkodrŽ, Albania

  • a priest for 65.6 years
  • a cardinal for 2.1 years

Source(s):
  • card/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Necrology (back)
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 26 Nov 1994

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast