Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bl. Frano Gjini

Deceased

Bishop of LezhŽ {Lesh, Alessio}, Albania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Feb 1886Born
28 Jun 190822.3Ordained PriestPriest of ShkodrŽ, Albania
29 Jun 193044.3AppointedAbbot of ShŽn Llezhri i Oroshit (Orosh), Albania
3 Jul 193044.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Semta
28 Oct 193044.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Semta
4 Jan 194659.8AppointedBishop of LezhŽ {Lesh, Alessio}, Albania
11 Mar 194862.0DiedBishop of LezhŽ {Lesh, Alessio}, Albania
5 Nov 2016Beatified

MicroData Summary for Bl. Frano Gjini
Bishop Bl. Frano Gjini (born , died ) Bishop of LezhŽ {Lesh, Alessio}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceShkodrŽ, Archdiocese of ShkodrŽ
Death PlaceShqipŽri

  • a priest for 39.7 years
  • a bishop for 17.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1941
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1930, Number 76
  • beat: CB, 14 Jul 2016
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 48, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 75, Additions/Corrections (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 27 Sep 2020

Quantcast