Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Leonard Stefan Deda, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of LezhŽ {Lesh, Alessio}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Mar 1863BornShkodrŽ
25 Jul 188320.4ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor
9 Apr 188522.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
9 Jan 190541.8AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of LezhŽ {Lesh, Alessio}, Albania
9 Jan 190541.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Thagora
30 Apr 190542.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thagora
21 Apr 190845.1SucceededBishop of LezhŽ {Lesh, Alessio}, Albania
8 Oct 191047.6DiedBishop of LezhŽ {Lesh, Alessio}, Albania

MicroData Summary for Leonard Stefan Deda:
Bishop Leonard Stefan Deda O.F.M. (born , died ) Bishop of LezhŽ {Lesh, Alessio}

  • a priest for 25.5 years
  • a bishop for 5.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 46
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations …piscopales, Issue 1905, Number 21

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013