Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Fremiot Torres Oliver

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Ponce


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Oct 1925BornS. Germán
10 Apr 195024.5Ordained PriestPriest of Ponce, Puerto Rico
4 Nov 196439.0AppointedBishop of Ponce, Puerto Rico
21 Dec 196439.1Ordained BishopBishop of Ponce, Puerto Rico
10 Nov 200075.0RetiredBishop of Ponce, Puerto Rico
26 Jan 201286.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Ponce, Puerto Rico

MicroData Summary for Juan Fremiot Torres Oliver:
Bishop Juan Fremiot Torres Oliver (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Ponce

  • a priest for 61.8 years
  • a bishop for 47.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • d: CB, 26 Jan 2012
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013