Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Federico Polloni

Deceased

Bishop of Bertinoro, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Aug 1841Born
22 Dec 186625.3Ordained PriestPriest of Bertinoro, Italy
28 Nov 189857.2AppointedBishop of Bertinoro, Italy
4 Dec 189857.3Ordained BishopBishop of Bertinoro, Italy
10 Mar 192482.5DiedBishop of Bertinoro, Italy

MicroData Summary for Federico Polloni (VIAF: 259007644)
Bishop Federico Polloni (born , died ) Bishop of Bertinoro

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRicÚ, Diocese of Bertinoro
Ordained BishopSantissime Stimmate di San Francesco, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 57.2 years
  • a bishop for 25.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1921
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1925
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 157
  • d: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 92
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1898, Number 70

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 15 Jun 2017