Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José María Armas y Rosales

Deceased

Bishop of Tulancingo, Hidalgo, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Aug 1834Born
14 Jun 186328.8Ordained PriestPriest
4 Jun 189156.8AppointedBishop of Tulancingo, Hidalgo, México
15 Aug 189157.0Ordained BishopBishop of Tulancingo, Hidalgo, México
14 Sep 189157.0InstalledBishop of Tulancingo, Hidalgo, México
14 May 189863.7DiedBishop of Tulancingo, Hidalgo, México

MicroData Summary for José María Armas y Rosales
Bishop José María Armas y Rosales (born , died ) Bishop of Tulancingo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNochistlán
Ordained BishopCathedral, Zacatecas, Diocese of Zacatecas

  • a priest for 34.9 years
  • a bishop for 6.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 572
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1891, Number 34

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 13 Jun 2017