Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Rafael Sabás Camacho y García

Deceased

Bishop of Querétaro, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Dec 1826Born
16 Mar 185124.2Ordained PriestPriest of Guadalajara, Jalisco, México
27 Mar 188558.3AppointedBishop of Querétaro, México
24 May 188558.4Ordained BishopBishop of Querétaro, México
11 May 190881.4DiedBishop of Querétaro, México

MicroData Summary for Rafael Sabás Camacho y García
Bishop Rafael Sabás Camacho y García (born , died ) Bishop of Querétaro

EventPlace
Birth PlaceEtzatlán, Diocese of Querétaro
Ordained BishopCathedral, Querétaro, Diocese of Querétaro
Death PlaceQuerétaro, Diocese of Querétaro

  • a priest for 57.1 years
  • a bishop for 22.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 474
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 207, Number 17,105
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1885, Number 29

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 17 Jun 2017