Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Refugio Mercado Díaz

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Tehuantepec, Oaxaca

Titular Bishop of Turuzi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Jul 1942BornIxtlahuacán del Río
2 Apr 197229.7Ordained PriestPriest of Guadalajara, Jalisco, México
16 Sep 200361.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Tehuantepec, Oaxaca, México
16 Sep 200361.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Turuzi
15 Nov 200361.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Turuzi
10 Jun 200966.9ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Tehuantepec, Oaxaca, México
15 Oct 201472.2DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Tehuantepec, Oaxaca, México

MicroData Summary for José Refugio Mercado Díaz:
Bishop José Refugio Mercado Díaz (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Tehuantepec

  • a priest for 42.5 years
  • a bishop for 10.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 10 Jun 2009
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 173, Number 14,482
  • d: CB, 16 Oct 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v2.9.9, 5 Oct 2014; Data: 18 Oct 2014