Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Laurence Walter Youens

Deceased

Bishop of Northampton, England, Great Britain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Dec 1872Born
30 Jun 190128.5Ordained PriestPriest of Society of African Missions
1902²29.0IncardinatedPriest of Northampton, England, Great Britain
16 Jun 193360.5AppointedBishop of Northampton, England, Great Britain
25 Jul 193360.6Ordained BishopBishop of Northampton, England, Great Britain
14 Nov 193966.9DiedBishop of Northampton, England, Great Britain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Laurence Walter Youens
Bishop Laurence Walter Youens (born , died ) Bishop of Northampton

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHigh Wycombe, Buckinghamshire, Diocese of Northampton, England
Ordained PriestChoubrah, Cairo, Prefecture Apostolic of Delta del Nilo, Egypt
Ordained BishopOur Lady Immaculate and St. Thomas of Canterbury, Cathedral, Northampton, Northamptonshire, Diocese of Northampton, England
Death PlaceBishop's House, Marriott Street, Northampton, Northamptonshire, Diocese of Northampton, England
Buried Place (Original)St. Michael and All Angels, Abbey, Belmont, Hereford, Herefordshire, Archdiocese of Cardiff, Wales

  • a priest for 38.3 years
  • a bishop for 6.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1933, Number 51
  • b: Arundel to Zabi, Page 223
  • mn/dp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 227, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • loc: CL, 27 Mar 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast