Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Charles Borromeo McLaughlin

Deceased

Bishop of Saint Petersburg, Florida, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Sep 1913Born
6 Jun 194127.6Ordained PriestPriest of New York, New York, USA
13 Jan 196450.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Raleigh, North Carolina, USA
13 Jan 196450.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Risinium
15 Apr 196450.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Risinium
2 May 196854.5AppointedBishop of Saint Petersburg, Florida, USA
14 Dec 197865.2DiedBishop of Saint Petersburg, Florida, USA

MicroData Summary for Charles Borromeo McLaughlin
Bishop Charles Borromeo McLaughlin (born , died ) Bishop of Saint Petersburg

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNew York, NY, Archdiocese of New York, New York
Ordained PriestNew York, NY, Archdiocese of New York, New York

  • a priest for 37.5 years
  • a bishop for 14.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c1: CB, 9 Feb 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast