Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Daniel Mageean

Deceased

Bishop of Down and Connor, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 May 1882Born
17 Jun 190624.1Ordained PriestPriest of Down and Connor, Ireland
31 May 192947.0AppointedBishop of Down and Connor, Ireland
25 Aug 192947.3Ordained BishopBishop of Down and Connor, Ireland
17 Jan 196279.6DiedBishop of Down and Connor, Ireland

MicroData Summary for Daniel Mageean
Bishop Daniel Mageean (born , died ) Bishop of Down and Connor

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLisowen, Saintfield

  • a priest for 55.5 years
  • a bishop for 32.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1929, Number 67

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 24 Jun 2017