Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Ogoja

Dioecesis Ogogiaensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • John Ebebe Ayah, Bishop

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 1 January 1955
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Calabar
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Nigeria
  • Square Kilometers: 12,557 (4,850 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: P.O. Box 27, Ogoja, Cross River State, Nigeria
  • Telephone: (087)424.012

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Ogoja
13 March 1938ErectedPrefecture Apostolic of Calabar Prefecture Apostolic of Ogoja (erected)
Diocese of Ogoja
1 January 1955ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Ogoja Diocese of Ogoja
1 March 1973Territory LostDiocese of Ogoja Diocese of Abakaliki (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Prefecture Apostolic of Ogoja
19509,452750,0001.3%1414675116ap1951
Diocese of Ogoja
1970135,0001,602,5338.4%641013,50045321ap1971
1980103,710896,00011.6%1514293,5761435ap1981
1990180,3741,217,00014.8%187257,214108219ap1991
1999259,2432,074,75012.5%333367,20134222ap2000
2000269,7492,100,00012.8%401416,57914226ap2001
2001282,3811,315,66221.5%481495,76214728ap2002
2002297,8911,465,66320.3%462486,20624532ap2003
2003313,5441,524,28920.6%583615,14034636ap2004
2004332,3731,536,29421.6%643674,96054938ap2005

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.8.6, 8 Jan 2013; data: 2 Feb 2013