Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Benedict Charles Franzetta

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Youngstown, Ohio

Titular Bishop of Opitergium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Aug 1921BornEast Liverpool
29 Apr 195028.7Ordained PriestPriest of Youngstown, Ohio, USA
26 Jul 198058.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Youngstown, Ohio, USA
26 Jul 198058.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Opitergium
4 Sep 198059.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Opitergium
4 Sep 199675.0RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Youngstown, Ohio, USA
26 Sep 200685.1DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Youngstown, Ohio, USA

MicroData Summary for Benedict Charles Franzetta:
Bishop Benedict Charles Franzetta (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Youngstown

  • a priest for 56.4 years
  • a bishop for 26.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 187, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015