Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John McLachlan

Deceased

Bishop of Galloway, Scotland, Great Britain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Sep 1826Born
16 Mar 185023.5Ordained PriestPriest of Western District, Scotland, Great Britain
22 Mar 187851.5AppointedBishop of Galloway, Scotland, Great Britain
23 May 187851.7Ordained BishopBishop of Galloway, Scotland, Great Britain
16 Jan 189366.3DiedBishop of Galloway, Scotland, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for John McLachlan
Bishop John McLachlan (born , died ) Bishop of Galloway

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGlasgow, Vicariate Apostolic of Lowland District, Scotland
Ordained PriestRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Ordained BishopSt. Andrew, Cathedral, Glasgow, Archdiocese of Glasgow, Scotland
Death PlaceSt. Andrew, Pro-Cathedral, Dumfries, Dumfries-shire, Diocese of Galloway, Scotland
Buried Place (Original)Crypt, St. Andrew, Pro-Cathedral, Dumfries, Dumfries-shire, Diocese of Galloway, Scotland
Buried Place (Current)Lost

  • a priest for 42.8 years
  • a bishop for 14.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 178
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1878, Number 26
  • loc: CL, 27 Mar 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 8 Apr 2018