Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Célestin Hakizimana

Bishop of Gikongoro, Rwanda

Apostolic Administrator of Cyangugu


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Aug 1963 Born
21 Jul 199127.9Ordained PriestPriest of Kigali, Rwanda
26 Nov 201451.2AppointedBishop of Gikongoro, Rwanda
24 Jan 201551.4Ordained BishopBishop of Gikongoro, Rwanda
16 Mar 201854.5AppointedApostolic Administrator of Cyangugu, Rwanda

MicroData Summary for Célestin Hakizimana
Bishop Célestin Hakizimana (born ) Bishop of Gikongoro

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKigali
Ordained Bishopstade de Nyagisenyi, Gikongoro, Diocese of Gikongoro

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Gikongoro.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 26 Nov 2014
  • ln: CB, 26 Nov 2014
  • ob: CB, 9 Dec 2014
  • ob/c2+: CB, 24 Dec 2014
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 222, Number 18,356
  • aadm: CB, 3 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast