Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Anaclet Mwumvaneza

Bishop of Nyundo, Rwanda


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Dec 1956 Born
25 Jul 199134.6Ordained PriestPriest of Kigali, Rwanda
11 Mar 201659.2AppointedBishop of Nyundo, Rwanda
21 May 201659.4Ordained BishopBishop of Nyundo, Rwanda

MicroData Summary for Anaclet Mwumvaneza
Bishop Anaclet Mwumvaneza (born ) Bishop of Nyundo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMurambi

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Nyundo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 11 Mar 2016
  • ob: CB, 27 Apr 2016
  • c2: CB, 21 May 2016
  • c3+: CB, 22 May 2016
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 228, Number 18,917

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast