Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Philippe-François Sausin

Deceased

Bishop of Blois, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Feb 1756Born
1780¹23.8Ordained PriestPriest
12 Feb 182367.0SelectedBishop of Blois, France
16 May 182367.2ConfirmedBishop of Blois, France
20 Jul 182367.4Ordained BishopBishop of Blois, France
5 Mar 184488.0DiedBishop of Blois, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Philippe-François Sausin (VIAF: 316757940)
Bishop Philippe-François Sausin (born , died ) Bishop of Blois

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOrange

  • a priest for 64.1 years
  • a bishop for 20.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 113
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1823, Number 39

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast