Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio José Ramírez Salaverría

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Maturín, Venezuela


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Oct 1917Born
14 Jul 194022.7Ordained PriestPriest of Cumaná, Venezuela
24 May 195840.5AppointedBishop of Maturín, Venezuela
14 Sep 195840.8Ordained BishopBishop of Maturín, Venezuela
7 May 199476.5RetiredBishop of Maturín, Venezuela
28 Jun 201496.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Maturín, Venezuela

MicroData Summary for Antonio José Ramírez Salaverría
Bishop Antonio José Ramírez Salaverría (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Maturín

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCariaco

  • a priest for 73.9 years
  • a bishop for 55.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 221, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast