Catholic-Hierarchy DC

[Constitutional Bishop François Xavier Moise] †

Civil Constitution of the Clergy

Not in Union with the Holy See

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of [Jura (Constitutional), France]


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Dec 1742Born
30 Mar 179148.2SelectedBishop of [Jura (Constitutional), France]
10 Apr 179148.3Ordained BishopBishop of [Jura (Constitutional), France]
1801²58.0ResignedBishop of [Jura (Constitutional), France]
7 Feb 181370.1DiedBishop Emeritus of [Jura (Constitutional), France]

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for François Xavier Moise (VIAF: 107679979)
Bishop François Xavier Moise (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Jura

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLes Gras
Ordained BishopS. Roch, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris
Death PlaceMorteau

  • a bishop for 21.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1791, Number 53

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 14 Oct 2018

Quantcast