Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Ramón Silvestre Masiá y Vidiella, O.F.M. Obs. †

Deceased

Bishop of Loja, Ecuador


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Dec 1815Born
7 May 183115.3ProfessedMember of Order of Observant Friars Minor
8 May 183216.3Perpetual VowsMember of Order of Observant Friars Minor
22 Dec 183822.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Observant Friars Minor
17 Sep 187559.7AppointedBishop of Loja, Ecuador
21 Sep 187660.7Ordained BishopBishop of Loja, Ecuador
30 Nov 187660.9InstalledBishop of Loja, Ecuador
15 Jan 190286.0DiedBishop of Loja, Ecuador

MicroData Summary for José Ramón Silvestre Masiá y Vidiella (VIAF: 233291311)
Bishop José Ramón Silvestre Masiá y Vidiella O.F.M. Obs. (born , died ) Bishop of Loja

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMontroig, Archdiocese of Tarragona, Spain
Ordained BishopLima, Archdiocese of Lima, Peru
Death PlaceLima, Archdiocese of Lima, Peru

  • a priest for 63.0 years
  • a bishop for 25.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 348
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 193, Number 15,660
  • b: LB, 13 Jul 2013
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,868, Page 46, Number 38
  • bd/dd/name: CB, 7 Jan 2017
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1876, Number 64
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 231, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 54, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 72, Additions/Corrections (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast