Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan José de Polo Valenzuela

Deceased

Bishop of Ayacucho o Huamanga (Guamanga)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Jul 1817BornIca
21 Dec 184427.5Ordained DeaconDeacon of Lima, Peru
17 May 184527.9Ordained PriestPriest of Lima, Peru
13 Nov 187457.4SelectedBishop of Ayacucho o Huamanga (Guamanga), Peru
17 Sep 187558.2ConfirmedBishop of Ayacucho o Huamanga (Guamanga), Peru
18 Jan 187658.5Ordained BishopBishop of Ayacucho o Huamanga (Guamanga), Peru
2 Nov 188265.3DiedBishop of Ayacucho o Huamanga (Guamanga), Peru

MicroData Summary for Juan José de Polo Valenzuela:
Bishop Juan José de Polo Valenzuela (born , died ) Bishop of Ayacucho o Huamanga (Guamanga)

  • a priest for 37.5 years
  • a bishop for 6.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 194, Number 15,714
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 310
  • c012: LB, 31 Jan 2013
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 214, Number 17,746

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013