Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giovanni Antonio Gianotti (Giannotti)

Deceased

Bishop of Saluzzo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Jan 1784BornTorino
20 Dec 180622.9Ordained PriestPriest
9 Mar 183349.1SelectedArchbishop of Sassari, Italy
15 Apr 183349.2ConfirmedArchbishop of Sassari, Italy
26 May 183349.4Ordained BishopArchbishop of Sassari, Italy
1 Apr 183753.2ResignedArchbishop of Sassari, Italy
26 Apr 183753.3SelectedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Saluzzo, Italy
19 May 183753.3ConfirmedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Saluzzo, Italy
6 Aug 183753.6InstalledBishop of Saluzzo, Italy
29 Oct 186379.8DiedBishop of Saluzzo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Antonio Gianotti (Giannotti):
Archbishop Giovanni Antonio Gianotti (Giannotti) (born , died ) Bishop of Saluzzo

  • a priest for 56.9 years
  • a bishop for 30.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1858
  • d: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 494
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 331, and Page 381

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013