Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vital Massé

Bishop Emeritus of Mont-Laurier, Québec


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Dec 1936 BornSaint-Barthélémy
26 May 196225.4Ordained PriestPriest of Joliette, Québec, Canada
20 Oct 199356.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Saint-Jérôme, Québec, Canada
20 Oct 199356.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Giru Marcelli
8 Dec 199357.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Giru Marcelli
8 Sep 200164.7AppointedBishop of Mont-Laurier, Québec, Canada
2 Feb 201275.1RetiredBishop of Mont-Laurier, Québec, Canada

MicroData Summary for Vital Massé:
Bishop Vital Massé (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Mont-Laurier

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Mont-Laurier.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 136, Number 12,181
  • r: Bollettino, 2 Feb 2012

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013